MN SF840 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employee personal sick leave benefit use expansion
Title
Employee personal sick leave benefit use expansion
Sponsors
Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] |
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Patti Fritz [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] |
Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Carly Melin [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] |
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] |
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] | Rep. John Benson [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Joe Radinovich [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] |
Rep. Zachary Dorholt [D] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: Hansen motion - Adoption (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: Hansen motion - Adoption (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 87 | |
2013-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2013-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 99-35 |
2013-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2013-05-16 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 93-40 |
2013-05-16 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 63-0 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 41-25 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Author added Bakk |
2013-05-13 | House | House conferees Hansen, Melin, and Kieffer. |
2013-05-13 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate conferees Champion, Hayden, Nelson |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House conferees Hansen; Melin; Kieffer |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate conferees Champion; Hayden; Nelson |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2013-04-25 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 100-31 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-04-25 | House | Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-16 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-04-15 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF568 |
2013-04-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |