MN SF86 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Carbon dioxide emissions increase by utilities ban modification
Title
Carbon dioxide emissions increase by utilities ban modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-22 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference committee (Y: 75 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment to Amendment (Y: 67 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment to Amendment (Y: 67 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - Amendment (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor veto | |
2011-05-27 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 96 | |
2011-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-22 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 75-54 |
2011-05-22 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2011-05-22 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2011-05-22 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2011-05-22 | House | Senate concurrence and repassage vote: 44-22 |
2011-05-22 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Third reading vote: 44-22 |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2011-05-16 | Senate | House conferees Beard; O'Driscoll; Koenen |
2011-05-14 | House | House conferees Beard, O'Driscoll, Koenen |
2011-05-14 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2011-05-14 | House | Senate conferees Rosen, Stumpf, and Magnus |
2011-05-14 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate conferees Rosen; Stumpf; Magnus |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Taken from table |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Laid on table |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2011-05-11 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 76-54 |
2011-05-11 | House | Third reading as amended |
2011-05-11 | House | Amendments offered |
2011-05-11 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2011-05-11 | House | Amended |
2011-05-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-04-18 | House | Second reading |
2011-04-18 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-04-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF72 |
2011-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 42-18 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |