MN SF877 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act; anti-racism training and implicit bias continuing education requirement; maternal death studies expansion to include maternal morbidity; appropriating money
Title
Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act; anti-racism training and implicit bias continuing education requirement; maternal death studies expansion to include maternal morbidity; appropriating money
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
Sen. Jen McEwen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Murphy |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Authors added Wiklund; Hawj |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF660 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Author added Fischer