MN SF880 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health care plans coverage mandates and proposals evaluation provisions modifications
Title
Health care plans coverage mandates and proposals evaluation provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Benjamin Kruse [R] | Sen. David Hann [R] | Sen. Chris Gerlach [R] |
Sen. Linda Scheid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |