MN SF886 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - HF substituted on General Orders HF740
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - HF substituted on General Orders HF740
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus lands bill
Title
Omnibus lands bill
Sponsors
Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] | Sen. Lyle Koenen [D] | Sen. Bev Scalze [D] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF740 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |