MN SF894 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 147 03/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 147 03/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health care facilities resident case mix classification provisions modifications
Title
Health care facilities resident case mix classification provisions modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Secretary of State Chapter 147 03/14/14 | |
2014-03-17 | Governor's action Approval 03/14/14 | |
2014-03-14 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-03-13 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 126-0 |
2014-03-10 | House | Third reading |
2014-03-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2013-05-18 | House | Second reading |
2013-05-18 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1179 |
2013-05-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |