MN SF907 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Author added Senjem
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Author added Senjem
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
East African Community Economic Development Pilot Grant Program appropriation
Title
East African Community Economic Development Pilot Grant Program appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Author added Senjem |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1364 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Author added Baker