MN SF96 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Issuance authorization and appropriation of shelter facility appropriation bonds
Title
Issuance authorization and appropriation of shelter facility appropriation bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Author added Morrison |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1218 (Similar To) 2023-02-06 - Author added Berg