MO HB1413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
Pending: Senate Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
Pending: Senate Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies Missouri driver's licenses and nondriver's licenses to include a symbol that indicates that the holder of the license is a United States citizen
Title
Modifies Missouri driver's licenses and nondriver's licenses to include a symbol that indicates that the holder of the license is a United States citizen
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |