MO HB1473 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the county party committees of Jackson County to elect representatives from districts that are equal in population
Title
Requires the county party committees of Jackson County to elect representatives from districts that are equal in population
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |