MO HB1481 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Financial Institutions (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Financial Institutions (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the amount of interest a title lender can charge on loans and requires the average interest rate being charged by credit unions to be made available to the public at least quarterly
Title
Limits the amount of interest a title lender can charge on loans and requires the average interest rate being charged by credit unions to be made available to the public at least quarterly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-30 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1481&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1481I.htm |