MO HB1599 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for an adopted person to obtain a copy of his or her original birth certificate
Title
Establishes procedures for an adopted person to obtain a copy of his or her original birth certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 129 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 127 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 127 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: HB 1599 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-07-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 127 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 129 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-02 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |