MO HB1599 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding local use taxes by modifying the ballot language for voter approval
Title
Changes the laws regarding local use taxes by modifying the ballot language for voter approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1599&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4804H.01I.pdf |