MO HB1684 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows electrical corporations to charge for services based on the costs of certain construction work in progress
Title
Allows electrical corporations to charge for services based on the costs of certain construction work in progress
Sponsors
Rep. John Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: HB 1684 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: HB 1684 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: HB 1684 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Lounge. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-30 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |