MO HB1761 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to boat dealer inspections and renewals
Title
Modifies laws relating to boat dealer inspections and renewals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - House: HB 1761 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-03-31 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-30 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-30 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |