MO HB1807 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits educational institutions from mandating COVID-19 vaccines or gene therapy
Title
Prohibits educational institutions from mandating COVID-19 vaccines or gene therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |