MO HB1807 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Breast Cancer Awareness Trust Fund, highway designations, recreational off-highway vehicles, municipal vehicles, and special license plates
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Breast Cancer Awareness Trust Fund, highway designations, recreational off-highway vehicles, municipal vehicles, and special license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-06 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 124 NOES: 005 | |
2012-05-18 | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 132 NOES: 002 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Requests House to Concur (S) | |
2012-05-14 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2012-05-02 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-02 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED YEAS: 26 NAYS: 05 | |
2012-05-02 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SS PENDING | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-04-26 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, 8:00 A.M., SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-27 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |