MO HB1807 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding newborn screening tests
Title
Changes the laws regarding newborn screening tests
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Solon [R] | Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care(H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |