MO HB1823 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public schools to provide annual instruction and training in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and first aid for choking to high school pupils
Title
Requires public schools to provide annual instruction and training in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and first aid for choking to high school pupils
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |