MO HB1836 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Governor to convey state property located in the City of Macon to the State Highways and Transportation Commission
Title
Authorizes the Governor to convey state property located in the City of Macon to the State Highways and Transportation Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Shively [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1836&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1836I.htm |