MO HB1959 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a request for records filed by the recorder of deeds dated after December 31, 1969, to be made to the office in which the record was originally filed
Title
Requires a request for records filed by the recorder of deeds dated after December 31, 1969, to be made to the office in which the record was originally filed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1959&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1959I.htm |