MO HB1959 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits specified increases in premiums or fees charged for sewage or wastewater treatment in St. Charles County without approval by the voters
Title
Prohibits specified increases in premiums or fees charged for sewage or wastewater treatment in St. Charles County without approval by the voters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1959&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1959I.htm |