MO HB1959 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act"
Title
Establishes the "Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act"
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |