MO HB1961 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a state agency to repeal two existing rules before enacting a new one
Title
Requires a state agency to repeal two existing rules before enacting a new one
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-02-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |