MO HB1963 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the conditions when stormwater runoff will be considered to flow to a sewer maintained by the Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District for purposes of charging the property owner a stormwater fee
Title
Specifies the conditions when stormwater runoff will be considered to flow to a sewer maintained by the Metropolitan St. Louis Sewer District for purposes of charging the property owner a stormwater fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1963&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1963I.htm |