MO HB1963 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the early parole of certain offenders over the age of 65
Title
Authorizes the early parole of certain offenders over the age of 65
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lair [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Corrections(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1963&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1963I.PDF |