MO HB1964 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Health Insurance Pool
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Health Insurance Pool
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Ervin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred: Healthcare Transformation (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1964&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1964I.htm |