MO HB1964 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding public safety officers who are eligible for a survivor's and disabled employee's educational grant and the disbursement of any unpaid workers compensation into his or her estate
Title
Changes the laws regarding public safety officers who are eligible for a survivor's and disabled employee's educational grant and the disbursement of any unpaid workers compensation into his or her estate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: HB 1964 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 63 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: HB 1964 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 51 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-02-23 - House - House: HB 1964 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 51 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 83 NOES: 63 PRESENT: 13 |
2016-02-25 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-23 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 3 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |