MO HB1964 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal actions.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal actions.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hovis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |