MO HB1968 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health organizations and risk-based capital
Title
Changes the laws regarding health organizations and risk-based capital
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-19 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 |
2014-05-06 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 148 NOES: 2 |
2014-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 29 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 9:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 2 |
2014-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |