MO HB1968 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the "Show Me" tartan as the official tartan of the state of Missouri.
Title
Designates the "Show Me" tartan as the official tartan of the state of Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Grier [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1968 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 5, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 8 |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |