MO HB1969 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the termination of water service
Title
Changes the laws regarding the termination of water service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred: Special Stand Com on Governmental Affairs (H) | |
2012-03-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1969&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1969I.htm |