MO HB1969 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the confiscation of animals
Title
Changes the laws regarding the confiscation of animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - House: HB 1969 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-04-25 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |