MO HB1972 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the requirements for providing comprehensive health care for public assistance recipients
Title
Changes the requirements for providing comprehensive health care for public assistance recipients
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] | Rep. Tom Flanigan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care(H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1972&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1972I.htm |