MO HB1972 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property in Oregon County
Title
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property in Oregon County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-28 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |