MO HB2036 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to allergy prevention and responses in child care facilities
Title
Establishes provisions relating to allergy prevention and responses in child care facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Weber [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |