MO HB2083 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to sewage disposal
Title
Modifies provisions relating to sewage disposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Objection Filed. Removed from Consent Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |