MO HB2282 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-23 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-23 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Building Permit Reform Act"
Title
Establishes the "Building Permit Reform Act"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2024, 9:30 a.m., SCR 1 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2024-03-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 8 |
2024-03-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |