MO HB2283 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain employees of the Department of Corrections to receive hazardous duty pay
Title
Requires certain employees of the Department of Corrections to receive hazardous duty pay
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Corrections(H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2283&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2283I.PDF |