MO HB2332 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to home producers of alcohol and allows direct shipments of distilled spirits to residents of this state
Title
Modifies provisions relating to home producers of alcohol and allows direct shipments of distilled spirits to residents of this state
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2024-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |