MO HB2445 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the use of moneys in the Alcohol and Tobacco Control Fund.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the use of moneys in the Alcohol and Tobacco Control Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - House: HB 2445 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 8:15am, SCR 1 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |