MO HB2498 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to worker classification
Title
Modifies provisions relating to worker classification
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |