MO HB2548 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to staffing requirements for emergency departments in hospitals
Title
Creates provisions relating to staffing requirements for emergency departments in hospitals
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Christ [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |