MO HB2555 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to expungement
Title
Establishes provisions relating to expungement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |