MO HB2556 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Property Assessment Clean Energy Act
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Property Assessment Clean Energy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Banking(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2556&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2556I.PDF |