MO HB2576 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of higher education to create guidance regarding notice of public employee eligibility for loan forgiveness and requires public employers to give such notice to employees
Title
Requires the department of higher education to create guidance regarding notice of public employee eligibility for loan forgiveness and requires public employers to give such notice to employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2576&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2576I.PDF |