MO HB2852 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide instruction in cursive writing
Title
Requires school districts to provide instruction in cursive writing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Education Reform(H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |