MO HCR59 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves the final order of rulemaking for the proposed rule 19 CSR 15-8.410 relating to the Personal Care Attendant Wage Range
Title
Disapproves the final order of rulemaking for the proposed rule 19 CSR 15-8.410 relating to the Personal Care Attendant Wage Range
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-25 - House - HCR 59 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2016-01-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-01-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |