MO HCR62 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the month of September as Sickle Cell Awareness Month in Missouri
Title
Designates the month of September as Sickle Cell Awareness Month in Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Cora Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HCR62&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5183H.01I.pdf |