MO HJR70 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment eliminating the prohibition on the use of public funds for the benefit of any religious or sectarian educational purpose
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment eliminating the prohibition on the use of public funds for the benefit of any religious or sectarian educational purpose
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR70&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HJR0070I.htm |